AK SB65 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/14/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/14/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the elements of a claim for medical malpractice; and relating to the definition of a health care provider-patient relationship.
Title
Liability Consulting Health Care Provider
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Kiehl [D] | Sen. Tom Begich [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-19 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/14/21 |
2021-08-19 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/16 CHAPTER 24 SLA 21 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | 3:00 P.M. 8/13/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2021-05-18 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 65(JUD) |
2021-05-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2021-05-18 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2021-05-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 65(JUD) |
2021-05-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-18 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 5 |
2021-05-18 | House | JUD HCS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2021-05-18 | House | NR: EASTMAN, KURKA |
2021-05-18 | House | DP: SNYDER, DRUMMOND, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN |
2021-05-18 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 5 |
2021-05-18 | House | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) NEW TITLE 4DP 2NR |
2021-05-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2021-05-05 | House | NR: PRAX, KURKA |
2021-05-05 | House | DP: MCCARTY, SPOHNHOLZ, SNYDER, ZULKOSKY |
2021-05-05 | House | PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR |
2021-05-05 | House | HSS RPT HCS(HSS) NEW TITLE 4DP 2NR |
2021-04-14 | House | HSS, JUD |
2021-04-14 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-12 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 65(JUD) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-04-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 65(JUD) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-04-12 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2021-04-03 | Senate | NR: REINBOLD, SHOWER |
2021-04-03 | Senate | DP: KIEHL, HUGHES, MYERS |
2021-04-03 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2021-02-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | NR: REINBOLD |
2021-02-19 | Senate | DP: WILSON, BEGICH, HUGHES |
2021-02-19 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2021-02-12 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH |
2021-02-03 | Senate | HSS, JUD |
2021-02-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Civil Procedure
Claims
Dentists
Liability
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians
Claims
Dentists
Liability
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians