AK SB57 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/11/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/11/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to parental involvement in education; adjusting pupil transportation funding; amending the time required for employers to give tenured teachers notification of their nonretention; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Literacy, Pupil Transp, Teacher Notices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 57(FIN)? Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 57(FIN)? Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/11/13 |
2013-09-10 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 69 SLA 13 |
2013-09-10 | Senate | 9:09 AM 7/3 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-24 | House | FN5: (EED) |
2013-06-24 | House | FN4: (EED) |
2013-06-24 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 65 |
2013-06-24 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13 |
2013-04-14 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-14 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2013-04-14 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2013-04-14 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 57(EDC) |
2013-04-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2013-04-14 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLMES |
2013-04-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-14 | House | PASSED Y33 N3 E2 A2 |
2013-04-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 57(EDC) |
2013-04-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR |
2013-04-13 | House | EDC HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2013 |
2013-04-13 | House | FN5: (EED) |
2013-04-13 | House | FN4: (EED) |
2013-04-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(EED) |
2013-04-13 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2013-04-13 | House | NR: THOMPSON, T.WILSON, GARA |
2013-04-13 | House | DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, EDGMON, COSTELLO, NEUMAN |
2013-04-13 | House | FIN RPT HCS(EDC) 5DP 3NR 1AM |
2013-04-08 | House | FN4: (EED) |
2013-04-08 | House | FN3: (EED) |
2013-04-08 | House | FN2: ZERO(EED) |
2013-04-08 | House | AM: P.WILSON |
2013-04-08 | House | NR: DRUMMOND, SADDLER |
2013-04-08 | House | DP: LEDOUX, SEATON, GATTIS |
2013-04-08 | House | EDC RPT HCS(EDC) 3DP 2NR 1AM |
2013-04-06 | House | EDC, FIN |
2013-04-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-05 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 57(FIN) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-05 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 57(FIN) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR |
2013-04-04 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-04 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-04 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | FN4: (EED) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | FN3: (EED) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(EED) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | NR: HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, OLSON |
2013-04-03 | Senate | DP: MEYER, DUNLEAVY |
2013-04-03 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 2DP 4NR SAME TITLE |
2013-03-20 | Senate | FISCAL INFO FORTHCOMING |
2013-03-20 | Senate | FN3: (EED) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(EED) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | FN1: (EED) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | AM: HUGGINS, STEDMAN, GARDNER |
2013-03-20 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, DUNLEAVY |
2013-03-20 | Senate | EDC RPT CS 2DP 3AM SAME TITLE |
2013-02-15 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2013-02-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Education
Employment
Families
Internet
Labor
Minors
Occupations & Professions
Public Employees
Rights
School Districts
Schools
Teachers
Transportation
Unorganized Borough
Employment
Families
Internet
Labor
Minors
Occupations & Professions
Public Employees
Rights
School Districts
Schools
Teachers
Transportation
Unorganized Borough