AK SB55 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - FN6: (CC:HB69&71/VARIOUS DEPTS)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - FN6: (CC:HB69&71/VARIOUS DEPTS)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to employer contributions to the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Employer Contributions To Pers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | FN6: (CC:HB69&71/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 71 |
2021-06-28 | House | FN6: (CC:HB69&71/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN3: (GOV/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69 |
2021-06-28 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2021-06-11 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 9 SLA 21 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 10:20 A.M. 6/8/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-17 | House | VERSION: SB 55 |
2021-05-17 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-17 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2021-05-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 55 |
2021-05-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021 |
2021-05-14 | House | FN5: (ADM) |
2021-05-14 | House | FN4: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2021-05-14 | House | FN3: (GOV/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS) |
2021-05-14 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, EDGMON, WOOL |
2021-05-14 | House | DP: RASMUSSEN, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, MERRICK |
2021-05-14 | House | FIN RPT 5DP 3NR |
2021-05-13 | House | L&C REFERRAL REMOVED |
2021-05-12 | House | L&C, FIN |
2021-05-12 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SB 55 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 55 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR |
2021-05-07 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-07 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/07/2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | FN5: (ADM) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | FN4: (GOV/VARIOUS) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | FN3: (GOV/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | NR: WILSON, OLSON |
2021-04-19 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI |
2021-04-19 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 2NR |
2021-03-05 | Senate | FN2: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | FN1: (GOV/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | DP: GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, HOLLAND |
2021-03-05 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO |
2021-03-05 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR |
2021-01-25 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-01-25 | Senate | FN2: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | FN1: (GOV/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2021-01-25 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |