AK SB51 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-16 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-16 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the installation of window tinting in automobiles.
Title
Motor Vehicle Window Tinting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-04-16 | TRA, JUD | |
2009-04-16 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-15 | VERSION: CSSB 51(TRA) | |
2009-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-04-15 | PASSED Y14 N5 V1 | |
2009-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 51(TRA) | |
2009-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-15 | TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | FN1: ZERO(DPS) | |
2009-03-18 | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE | |
2009-03-18 | DNP: THERRIAULT | |
2009-03-18 | DP: FRENCH | |
2009-03-18 | JUD RPT CS(TRA) 1DP 1DNP 2NR | |
2009-03-05 | FN1: ZERO(DPS) | |
2009-03-05 | AM: DAVIS, PASKVAN | |
2009-03-05 | NR: MEYER | |
2009-03-05 | DP: KOOKESH | |
2009-03-05 | TRA RPT CS 1DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE | |
2009-01-21 | TRA, JUD | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-21 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09 |