AK SB45 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Alaska coastal management program and relating to the extension; relating to the review of activities and regulations of the Alaska coastal management program; establishing the Alaska Coastal Policy Board; relating to the development, review, and approval of district coastal management plans; relating to the duties of the Department of Natural Resources relating to the Alaska coastal management program; relating to the review of certain consistency determinations; providing for an effective date by amending the effective date of secs. 1 - 13 and 18, ch. 31, SLA 2005; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Coastal Management Program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-24 | PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S) | |
2011-06-28 | ENGROSSED AND RETURNED TO SENATE | |
2011-06-28 | FAILED PASSAGE Y18 N18 E4 | |
2011-06-28 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 45(CRA) AM | |
2011-06-28 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-06-28 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-06-28 | RULES TO CALENDAR 6/28/2011 | |
2011-06-28 | FN7: (DNR) | |
2011-06-28 | FN6: (DEC) | |
2011-06-28 | FN5: (DEC) | |
2011-06-28 | DNP: HAWKER, T.WILSON, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2011-06-28 | DP: JOULE, GARA, EDGMON | |
2011-06-28 | FIN RPT 3DP 6DNP | |
2011-06-27 | FIN | |
2011-06-27 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-06-27 | SECOND SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2011-06-27 | VERSION: CSSB 45(CRA) AM | |
2011-06-27 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2011-06-27 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y15 N3 E2 | |
2011-06-27 | PASSED Y11 N7 E2 | |
2011-06-27 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 45(CRA) AM | |
2011-06-27 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y15 N3 E2 | |
2011-06-27 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y12 N6 E2 | |
2011-06-27 | CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-06-27 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-06-27 | RULES TO FIRST SUPP CALENDAR 6/27/11 | |
2011-06-27 | FIN REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2011-06-27 | SECOND SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2011-04-08 | RES REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2011-04-07 | FN4: (S.CRA/DNR) | |
2011-04-07 | FN3: (DEC) | |
2011-04-07 | FN2: ZERO(DEC) | |
2011-04-07 | DP: OLSON, WAGONER, MENARD, ELLIS | |
2011-04-07 | CRA RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE | |
2011-01-19 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2011-01-19 | FN2: ZERO(DEC) | |
2011-01-19 | FN1: (DNR) | |
2011-01-19 | CRA, RES, FIN | |
2011-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |