AK SB37 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/4/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/4/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Statewide Suicide Prevention Council; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Suicide Prevention Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/4/13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 37 SLA 13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | 2:05 PM 5/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-13 | House | VERSION: SB 37 |
2013-04-13 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-04-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-13 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E1 A1 |
2013-04-13 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2013-04-12 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, LEDOUX, MILLETT, KREISS-TOMKINS, SADDLER, DRUMMOND |
2013-04-12 | House | JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2013-04-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-12 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2013-04-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 37 |
2013-04-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, NAGEAK |
2013-04-10 | House | FN2: (DHS) |
2013-04-10 | House | DP: KAWASAKI, HOLMES, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GARA, COSTELLO |
2013-04-10 | House | FIN RPT 8DP |
2013-03-14 | House | FN1: (DHS) |
2013-03-14 | House | DP: HUGHES, ISAACSON, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, KELLER, LYNN |
2013-03-14 | House | STA RPT 6DP |
2013-03-07 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA |
2013-02-27 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, KAWASAKI, TUCK, PRUITT, P.WILSON, HERRON |
2013-02-27 | House | STA, FIN |
2013-02-27 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-02-25 | Senate | VERSION: SB 37 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-02-25 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E4 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MEYER, MICCICHE, OLSON, DUNLEAVY, KELLY |
2013-02-25 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 37 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-02-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-02-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2013 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | DP: MEYER, KELLY, HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2013-02-22 | Senate | FIN RPT 7DP |
2013-02-08 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH |
2013-02-06 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2013-02-06 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, STEDMAN, ELLIS |
2013-02-06 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP 2NR |
2013-01-30 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, GARDNER |
2013-01-25 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DYSON |
2013-01-25 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2013-01-25 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |