AK SB36 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to reporting requirements of the Board of Regents of the University of Alaska.
Title
U Of A Regents Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Stevens [R] | Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Sen. Mia Costello [R] |
Sen. William Wielechowski [D] | Sen. Tom Begich [D] | Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2022-04-04 | House | FN2: ZERO(UA) |
2022-04-04 | House | NR: HOPKINS, CRONK, GILLHAM |
2022-04-04 | House | DP: STORY, DRUMMOND |
2022-04-04 | House | EDC RPT 2DP 3NR |
2021-04-09 | House | EDC, STA |
2021-04-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-07 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 36(EDC) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-04-07 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 36(EDC) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-03-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/7 CALENDAR |
2021-03-31 | Senate | EDC CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-31 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-31 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(UA) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | NR: WILSON |
2021-03-29 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI |
2021-03-29 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(EDC) 3DP 1NR |
2021-03-19 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(UA) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BEGICH |
2021-03-19 | Senate | EDC RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, MICCICHE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2021-01-25 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-01-25 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |