AK SB32 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act stating that the development and operation of a hydroelectric site at Chikuminuk Lake is not an incompatible use in the Wood-Tikchik State Park.
Title
Chikuminuk Lake Hydroelectric Site
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR |
2013-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-02-13 | Senate | FN1: (DNR) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | NR: BISHOP |
2013-02-13 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, EGAN, GIESSEL |
2013-02-13 | Senate | CRA RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2013-02-08 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER CRA |
2013-02-08 | Senate | RES REFERRAL REMOVED |
2013-01-22 | Senate | CRA, RES |
2013-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |