AK SB3001 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/6/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/6/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making supplemental appropriations; making appropriations to capitalize funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Lng Project & Fund/agdc/supp.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-11-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/6/15 |
2015-11-20 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 11/5 CHAPTER 1 TSSLA 15 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | 8:36 AM 11/5/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-11-04 | House | VERSION: CSSB 3001(FIN) |
2015-11-04 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2015-11-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-11-04 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2015-11-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 3001(FIN) |
2015-11-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-11-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-11-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 11/4/2015 |
2015-11-04 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2015-11-04 | House | NR: PRUITT, WILSON, GATTIS |
2015-11-04 | House | DP: GARA, SADDLER, GUTTENBERG, EDGMON, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON |
2015-11-04 | House | FIN RPT 7DP 3NR 1AM |
2015-11-03 | House | FIN |
2015-11-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-11-03 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 3001(FIN) |
2015-11-03 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2015-11-03 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-11-03 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y16 N3 E1 |
2015-11-03 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2015-11-03 | Senate | COGHILL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2015-11-03 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-11-03 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N3 E1 |
2015-11-03 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 3001(FIN) |
2015-11-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 11/3 CALENDAR |
2015-11-02 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-11-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-11-02 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 11/2/2015 |
2015-11-02 | Senate | AM: DUNLEAVY |
2015-11-02 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP, OLSON, HOFFMAN |
2015-11-02 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 6DP 1AM NEW TITLE |
2015-10-24 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2015-10-24 | Senate | FIN |
2015-10-24 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appropriations
Attorney General
Budget
Budget Reserve Fund
Energy
Funds
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Public Finance
Resources
Revenue
Supplemental Appropriations
Attorney General
Budget
Budget Reserve Fund
Energy
Funds
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Public Finance
Resources
Revenue
Supplemental Appropriations