AK SB269 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/12/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/12/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the waiver of volume cap of recovery zone economic development bonds authorized by 26 U.S.C. 1400U-2 and reallocation by the Alaska Municipal Bond Bank Authority of the waived volume cap; relating to the waiver of volume cap of recovery zone facility bonds authorized by 26 U.S.C. 1400U-3 and reallocation by the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority of the waived volume cap; increasing the total amount of bonds and notes that the Alaska Municipal Bond Bank Authority may have outstanding; relating to revenue bonds and to obligations secured by lease that are issued by the Alaska Municipal Bond Bank Authority; relating to allocations of tax credit and bonding limits imposed by the federal government; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Econ. Stimulus Bonds: Reallocation/waiver
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/12/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 68 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:50 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-15 | VERSION: CSSB 269(FIN) | |
2010-04-15 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-15 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 E1 A7 | |
2010-04-15 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC | |
2010-04-15 | KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2010-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-15 | PASSED Y37 E1 A2 | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 269(FIN) | |
2010-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | FN2: (REV) | |
2010-04-14 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-14 | NR: DOOGAN, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, SALMON | |
2010-04-14 | DP: GARA, JOULE, THOMAS, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-14 | FIN RPT 5DP 6NR | |
2010-04-06 | FN2: (REV) | |
2010-04-06 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-06 | NR: LYNN, BUCH, T.WILSON | |
2010-04-06 | DP: HOLMES, OLSON | |
2010-04-06 | L&C RPT 2DP 3NR | |
2010-03-19 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-03-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-17 | VERSION: CSSB 269(FIN) | |
2010-03-17 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-17 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 269(FIN) | |
2010-03-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-17 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | FN2: (REV) | |
2010-03-10 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-10 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-03-10 | FIN RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE | |
2010-02-10 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2010-02-10 | FN2: (REV) | |
2010-02-10 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-02-10 | FIN | |
2010-02-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |