AK SB242 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
Pending: Senate Community & Regional Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
Pending: Senate Community & Regional Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to assessment of property, boards of equalization, and certification of assessors; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Property Assessment
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Kiehl [D] | Sen. Robert Myers [R] | Sen. Mike Shower [R] | Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] |
Sen. James Kaufman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): SHOWER, HUGHES |
2024-02-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MYERS |
2024-02-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS |
2024-02-19 | Senate | CRA |
2024-02-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=SB242 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0242A.PDF |