AK SB215 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to multi-line telephone systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhanced 911:multi-line Telephone Systems

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-10HouseVERSION: SB 215
2018-05-10HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-10HousePASSED Y36 N2 E1 A1
2018-05-10HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-05-10HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N37 E1 A1
2018-05-10HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UC
2018-05-10HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
2018-05-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 215
2018-05-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2018
2018-04-17HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2018-04-17HouseAM: WILSON, TILTON
2018-04-17HouseNR: PRUITT
2018-04-17HouseDP: GARA, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON
2018-04-17HouseFIN RPT 6DP 1NR 2AM
2018-04-12HouseFIN
2018-04-12HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-11SenateVERSION: SB 215
2018-04-11SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-04-11SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-11SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 215
2018-04-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-11SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018
2018-04-04SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2018-04-04SenateDP: BISHOP, STEDMAN, GARDNER
2018-04-04SenateCRA RPT 3DP
2018-03-07SenateCRA
2018-03-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback