AK SB189 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Alaska Commission on Aging; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Alaska Commission On Aging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-04-24 | House | FIN |
2024-04-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-22 | Senate | VERSION: SB 189 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-04-22 | Senate | PASSED Y20 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2024-04-19 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/22 CAL |
2024-04-19 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 189 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CAL |
2024-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | FN1: (DOH) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK, BISHOP |
2024-04-17 | Senate | FIN RPT 5DP |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): TOBIN, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS |
2024-01-16 | Senate | FIN |
2024-01-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |