AK SB177 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/22/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/22/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to nuclear facility siting permits; and relating to microreactors.
Title
Microreactors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/22/22 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/24 CHAPTER 4 SLA 22 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | 5:15 P.M. 5/20/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-20 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-16 | House | VERSION: CSSB 177(RES) |
2022-05-16 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-15 | House | PASSED Y29 N7 A4 |
2022-05-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 177(RES) |
2022-05-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-14 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | SESSION CANCELED 5/13 - ON 5/14 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2022-05-11 | House | AM: PATKOTAK |
2022-05-11 | House | NR: FIELDS, HOPKINS |
2022-05-11 | House | DNP: HANNAN |
2022-05-11 | House | DP: MCKAY, CRONK, RAUSCHER, GILLHAM, SCHRAGE |
2022-05-11 | House | RES RPT 5DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM |
2022-05-05 | House | RES |
2022-05-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-05-04 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 177(RES) |
2022-05-04 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-05-04 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2022-05-03 | Senate | KAWASAKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2022-05-03 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N2 E1 A1 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 177(RES) |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CAL |
2022-05-02 | Senate | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-02 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2022 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2022-04-22 | Senate | AM: KAWASAKI |
2022-04-22 | Senate | NR: STEVENS |
2022-04-22 | Senate | DP: REVAK, KIEHL, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE |
2022-04-22 | Senate | RES RPT CS 4DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | NR: GRAY-JACKSON, MYERS, WILSON |
2022-03-09 | Senate | DP: HUGHES |
2022-03-09 | Senate | CRA RPT 1DP 3NR |
2022-02-01 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2022-02-01 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | CRA, RES |
2022-02-01 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |