AK SB174 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services; and relating to the administration of programs for persons with physical and mental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Programs For Persons With Disabilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-10HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, RAUSCHER, TILTON, PRUITT
2018-05-10HouseVERSION: SB 174
2018-05-10HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-10HousePASSED Y36 N1 A3
2018-05-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 174
2018-05-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-10HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N36 A3
2018-05-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2018
2018-05-09HouseLEDOUX, JOSEPHSON, TALERICO, FOSTER
2018-05-09HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): BIRCH, DRUMMOND, MILLETT, KITO, THOMPSON, KAWASAKI, STUTES,
2018-05-08HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER, ZULKOSKY
2018-05-07HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, CHENAULT, JOHNSTON, SPOHNHOLZ
2018-04-26HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
2018-04-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GRENN, TARR, LINCOLN
2018-04-04HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): PARISH
2018-03-30HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2018-03-30HouseAM: EASTMAN
2018-03-30HouseNR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2018-03-30HouseDP: TARR, ZULKOSKY, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ
2018-03-30HouseHSS RPT 4DP 1NR 1AM
2018-03-19HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
2018-03-15HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2018-03-15HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2018-03-15HouseDP: DRUMMOND, RAUSCHER, ZULKOSKY, PARISH
2018-03-15HouseCRA RPT 4DP
2018-03-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
2018-03-05HouseCRA, HSS
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-01SenateVERSION: SB 174
2018-03-01SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-01SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2018-03-01SenateGARDNER, BEGICH, MEYER, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, OLSON, SHOWER, KELLY
2018-03-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, STEVENS
2018-03-01SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 174
2018-03-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-01SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-01SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2018
2018-02-22SenateFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2018-02-22SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, GIESSEL
2018-02-22SenateHSS RPT 5DP
2018-02-02SenateHSS
2018-02-02SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback