AK SB173 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-11 - COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN, MENARD
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-11 - COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN, MENARD
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to marine products and motorized recreational products; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Marine & Motorized Recreational Products
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Ellis [D] | Sen. Charlie Huggins [R] | Sen. Albert Kookesh [D] | Sen. Lesil McGuire [R] |
Sen. Linda Menard [R] | Sen. Kevin Meyer [R] | Sen. Donald Olson [D] | Sen. Joe Paskvan [D] |
Sen. Joe Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-11 | COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN, MENARD | |
2009-04-10 | COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS | |
2009-04-06 | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, ELLIS | |
2009-04-01 | COSPONSOR(S): KOOKESH | |
2009-03-27 | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE | |
2009-03-27 | L&C | |
2009-03-27 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Boats & Boating
Business
Consumer Affairs
Franchises
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Parks & Recreation
Sales
Trade Practices
Vessels
Boats & Boating
Business
Consumer Affairs
Franchises
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Parks & Recreation
Sales
Trade Practices
Vessels
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=26&bill=SB173 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/26/Bills/SB0173A.PDF |