AK SB139 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-17 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-17 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing an employment incentive program for certain health care professionals employed in the state; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Incentives For Certain Medical Providers
Sponsors
Sen. Bettye Davis [D] | Sen. Dennis Egan [D] | Sen. Hollis French [D] | Sen. Albert Kookesh [D] |
Sen. Kevin Meyer [R] | Sen. Donald Olson [D] | Sen. Joe Paskvan [D] | Sen. William Wielechowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-17 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2010-04-17 | IN FINANCE | |
2010-04-17 | RLS TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT | |
2010-04-12 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI | |
2010-04-12 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-04-12 | FIN | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-12 | VERSION: CSSB 139(FIN) | |
2010-04-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-12 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-12 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 139(FIN) | |
2010-04-12 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-11 | FN3: (DHS) | |
2010-04-11 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2010-04-11 | FIN RPT CS 7DP NEW TITLE | |
2010-01-27 | COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, EGAN | |
2009-04-07 | FN2: ZERO(EED) | |
2009-04-07 | FN1: (DHS) | |
2009-04-07 | AM: DYSON | |
2009-04-07 | DP: DAVIS, ELLIS, THOMAS, PASKVAN | |
2009-04-07 | HSS RPT CS 4DP 1AM SAME TITLE | |
2009-03-09 | HSS, FIN | |
2009-03-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Dentists
Education
Employment
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Labor
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
State Aid
Unorganized Borough
Education
Employment
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Labor
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
State Aid
Unorganized Borough