AK SB129 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/24/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act naming the Matt Glover Bike Path.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Matt Glover Bike Path

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-28SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/24/24
2024-06-28SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 6 SLA 24
2024-06-25Senate12:45 P.M. 6/24/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2024-05-31SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2024-05-02HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI, SCHRAGE
2024-05-02HouseVERSION: SB 129
2024-05-02HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2024-05-02HousePASSED Y39 A1
2024-05-02HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 129
2024-05-02HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2024-05-02HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2024-05-02HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2024
2024-02-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): MINA
2024-02-14HouseFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2024-02-14HouseDP: MINA, STUTES, MCKAY, VANCE, SUMNER, C.JOHNSON, MCCABE
2024-02-14HouseTRA RPT 7DP
2024-02-07HouseTRA
2024-02-07HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2024-02-05SenateVERSION: SB 129
2024-02-05SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2024-02-05SenatePASSED Y19 N0 E1
2024-02-05SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 129
2024-02-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/5 CAL
2024-02-02SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2024-02-02SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/2/2024
2024-01-26SenateFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2024-01-26SenateDP: KAUFMAN, MYERS, TOBIN
2024-01-26SenateTRA RPT 3DP
2023-04-14SenateTRA
2023-04-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback