AK SB1 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-23 - TASK FORCE REPORT RECEIVED
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-23 - TASK FORCE REPORT RECEIVED
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring the state Board of Education and Early Development to provide an annual report to the legislature; and establishing a joint legislative task force on theme-based education.
Title
Bd Of Educ Report/legis Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | TASK FORCE REPORT RECEIVED | |
2011-08-24 | DICK (CHAIR), STOLTZE, NEUMAN (ALTERNATE) | |
2011-08-24 | JOINT LEGISLATIVE THEME-BASED TASK FORCE APPOINTMENTS: MEYER, THOMAS (ALTERNATE) | |
2011-06-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/25/11 | |
2011-06-24 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 14 SLA 11 | |
2011-06-24 | 12:10 PM 5/23/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2011-04-16 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1 | |
2011-04-16 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2011-04-15 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 1(RLS) | |
2011-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2011-04-15 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO | |
2011-04-15 | PASSED Y39 N1 | |
2011-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 1(RLS) | |
2011-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-15 | RLS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2011 | |
2011-04-15 | FN1: ZERO(EED) | |
2011-04-15 | DP: TUCK, AUSTERMAN, CHENAULT, GRUENBERG, OLSON, GATTO, JOHNSON | |
2011-04-15 | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 15 | |
2011-04-15 | RLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 7DP | |
2011-04-14 | RLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 | |
2011-04-11 | FN1: ZERO(EED) | |
2011-04-11 | THOMAS | |
2011-04-11 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, GARA, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, STOLTZE, | |
2011-04-11 | FIN RPT 9DP | |
2011-04-01 | FN1: ZERO(EED) | |
2011-04-01 | DP: P.WILSON, PRUITT, SEATON, KAWASAKI, FEIGE, DICK | |
2011-04-01 | EDC RPT 6DP | |
2011-03-31 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI | |
2011-03-09 | EDC, FIN | |
2011-03-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-03-07 | VERSION: CSSB 1(EDC) | |
2011-03-07 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2011-03-07 | PASSED Y16 N- E4 | |
2011-03-07 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 1(EDC) | |
2011-03-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/7 CALENDAR | |
2011-03-01 | EDC CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-03-01 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-03-01 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | FN1: ZERO(EED) | |
2011-02-23 | NR: OLSON | |
2011-02-23 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS | |
2011-02-23 | FIN RPT CS(EDC) 6DP 1NR | |
2011-02-02 | FN1: ZERO(EED) | |
2011-02-02 | DP: MEYER, THOMAS, STEVENS, DAVIS, FRENCH | |
2011-02-02 | EDC RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE | |
2011-01-19 | EDC, FIN | |
2011-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |