AK HR8 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Fisheries Bycatch Regulations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fisheries Bycatch Regulations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-02HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2024-05-02HouseRES REFERRAL REMOVED
2024-05-02HouseFN1: ZERO(H.FSH/LEG)
2024-05-02HouseNR: HIMSCHOOT
2024-05-02HouseDP: CARPENTER, MCCABE, VANCE
2024-05-02HouseFSH RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 3DP 1NR
2024-05-01HouseFSH WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
2024-03-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ALLARD
2023-04-20HouseFSH, RES
2023-04-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback