AK HR4 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - MEMBERS: TUCK REMOVED AS VICE CHAIR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - MEMBERS: TUCK REMOVED AS VICE CHAIR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Special Cmte: Military/vet Affairs
Title
House Special Cmte: Military/vet Affairs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | MEMBERS: TUCK REMOVED AS VICE CHAIR |
2020-01-21 | House | MEMBERS: SHAW CHANGED TO CO-CHAIR, THOMPSON ADDED AS CO-CHAIR, |
2019-05-07 | House | MEMBERS: SHAW REPLACED LEDOUX AS CHAIR, SPOHNHOLZ REPLACED TARR |
2019-05-07 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 5/6 HOUSE RESOLVE 4 |
2019-04-05 | House | 4:40 P.M. 4/5/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-02-19 | House | LEDOUX (CHAIR), TUCK (VICE CHAIR), KOPP, TARR, THOMPSON, JACKSON, RAUSCHER |
2019-02-15 | House | VERSION: HR 4 |
2019-02-15 | House | PASSED Y37 E3 |
2019-02-15 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2019-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |