AK HR4 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-17 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-17 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a House Special Committee on Military and Veterans' Affairs.
Title
House Special Cmte: Military/vet Affairs
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-01-17 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-17 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | 2:25 PM 1/24/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-01-17 | House | TUCK (CHAIR), LEDOUX (VICE), PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER, REINBOLD, SADDLER |
2017-01-17 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2017-01-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.RLS) |
2017-01-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-01-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 1/17/2017 |
2017-01-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |