AK HR4 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - MEMBERS: SPOHNHOLZ REPLACED DRUMMOND
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - MEMBERS: SPOHNHOLZ REPLACED DRUMMOND
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a House Special Committee on Military and Veterans' Affairs.
Title
House Special Cmte: Military/vet Affairs
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-01-20 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | MEMBERS: SPOHNHOLZ REPLACED DRUMMOND |
2016-02-24 | House | MEMBERS: DRUMMOND REPLACED GRUENBERG |
2015-03-16 | House | MEMBER: LEDOUX (VICE CHAIR) |
2015-03-12 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 3/11 HOUSE RESOLVE 4 |
2015-01-23 | House | 3:17 PM 1/23/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-01-20 | House | HERRON (CHAIR), COLVER, HUGHES, LEDOUX, LYNN, GRUENBERG, TUCK |
2015-01-20 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2015-01-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.RLS) |
2015-01-20 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-01-20 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 1/20/2015 |
2015-01-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |