AK HR4 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - MEMBERS: T.WILSON REPLACED OLSON
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - MEMBERS: T.WILSON REPLACED OLSON
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a House Special Committee on Military and Veterans' Affairs.
Title
House Spec Com'tee: Military/vet Affairs
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | MEMBERS: T.WILSON REPLACED OLSON | |
2009-02-09 | PERMANENTLY FILED 2/6 HOUSE RESOLVE 4 | |
2009-01-28 | 3:10 PM 1/27/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-01-20 | GATTO (CHAIR), HARRIS, LYNN, OLSON, RAMRAS, BUCH, KAWASAKI | |
2009-01-20 | PASSED Y40 | |
2009-01-20 | FN1: ZERO(H.RLS) | |
2009-01-20 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-01-20 | READ THE FIRST TIME |