AK HJR9 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to pass legislation to open the coastal plain of the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge to oil and gas development; urging the United States Department of the Interior to recognize the private property rights of owners of land in and adjacent to the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge; relating to oil and gas exploration, development, production, and royalties; and relating to renewable and alternative energy technologies.
Title
Endorsing Anwr Leasing; Related Issues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 1 not germane (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 1 not germane (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 1 not germane (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 1 not germane (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-24 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 2 |
2015-03-06 | House | 9:38 AM 3/5/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-02-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): VAZQUEZ, MUNOZ |
2015-02-27 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E4 |
2015-02-20 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2015-02-18 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HJR 9(RES) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2015-02-18 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, MCGUIRE |
2015-02-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 9(RES) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-02-18 | Senate | RES SCS ADOPTED UC |
2015-02-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-02-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/18/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, MICCICHE, STEDMAN, STOLTZE |
2015-02-18 | Senate | RES RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE |
2015-02-11 | Senate | MICCICHE, BISHOP, MACKINNON, GIESSEL, EGAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, MEYER |
2015-02-11 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, STOLTZE, COGHILL, KELLY, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, STEVENS |
2015-02-11 | Senate | RES |
2015-02-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-02-09 | House | VERSION: HJR 9 |
2015-02-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2015-02-09 | House | PASSED Y36 E3 A1 |
2015-02-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 9 |
2015-02-06 | House | HELD TO 2/9 CALENDAR |
2015-02-04 | House | STUTES |
2015-02-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, PRUITT, JOHNSON, THOMPSON, WILSON, REINBOLD, LEDOUX, |
2015-02-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/6 CALENDAR |
2015-02-04 | House | SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y29 N10 E1 |
2015-02-04 | House | AM NO 1 RULED OUT OF ORDER |
2015-02-04 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2015-02-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-02-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/4/2015 |
2015-02-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.RES) |
2015-02-04 | House | NR: TARR |
2015-02-04 | House | DP: HERRON, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON, OLSON, SEATON, HAWKER, TALERICO |
2015-02-04 | House | RES RPT 7DP 1NR |
2015-02-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, OLSON |
2015-01-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2015-01-23 | House | RES |
2015-01-23 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Energy
Fish & Game (game)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Oil & Gas
Proclamations
Public Land
Resources
Revenue
Statehood Act
Fish & Game (game)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Oil & Gas
Proclamations
Public Land
Resources
Revenue
Statehood Act