AK HJR7 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3-2)
Status: Passed on October 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3-2)
Status: Passed on October 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opposing the proposed designation of an Aleutian Islands National Marine Sanctuary.
Title
Oppose Aleutian National Marine Sanctuary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: CSHJR 7(FSH) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: CSHJR 7(FSH) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-24 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 6 |
2015-04-03 | House | 9:35 AM 4/3/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-03-25 | Senate | VERSION: CSHJR 7(FSH) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2015-03-25 | Senate | COGHILL, DUNLEAVY, MCGUIRE, COSTELLO, KELLY |
2015-03-25 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, EGAN, BISHOP, MICCICHE, STEVENS |
2015-03-25 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 7(FSH) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-03-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-03-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | NR: STOLTZE |
2015-03-13 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI, STEDMAN, COGHILL |
2015-03-13 | Senate | RES RPT 5DP 1NR |
2015-03-06 | Senate | RES |
2015-03-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-03-04 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 7(FSH) |
2015-03-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-03-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, PRUITT, LEDOUX, TILTON, HUGHES |
2015-03-04 | House | PASSED Y35 E5 |
2015-03-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 7(FSH) |
2015-03-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-03-04 | House | FSH CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-03-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-03-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2015 |
2015-03-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TALERICO |
2015-03-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2015-03-02 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON |
2015-03-02 | House | DP: HERRON, HAWKER, OLSON, TARR, SEATON, TALERICO |
2015-03-02 | House | RES RPT CS(FSH) 6DP 1NR |
2015-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2015-02-06 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2015-02-06 | House | DP: HERRON, FOSTER, MILLETT, JOHNSON, ORTIZ, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES |
2015-02-06 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) 7DP |
2015-01-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2015-01-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STUTES |
2015-01-21 | House | FSH, RES |
2015-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boundaries
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (fish)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Parks & Recreation
Planning
Proclamations
Water
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (fish)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Parks & Recreation
Planning
Proclamations
Water