AK HJR29 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Department of the Interior, Bureau of Land Management, to plug legacy wells properly and to reclaim the legacy well sites as soon as possible in order to protect the environment in the Arctic region; and requesting the Office of the Governor to increase nationwide awareness about legacy wells and well sites.
Title
Blm Legacy Oil Well Clean Up/awareness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 30 | |
2012-06-07 | 4:08 PM 6/7/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-03-28 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E1 A1 | |
2012-03-26 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2012-03-23 | VERSION: SCS HJR 29(RES) AM S | |
2012-03-23 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2012-03-23 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2012-03-23 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 29(RES) AM S | |
2012-03-23 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-23 | STEDMAN, THOMAS, WIELECHOWSKI, HUGGINS, GIESSEL, DYSON, OLSON | |
2012-03-23 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COGHILL, MEYER, ELLIS, MENARD, PASKVAN, EGAN, DAVIS, MCGUIRE, | |
2012-03-23 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-23 | RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-23 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-23 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2012-03-21 | DP: WAGONER, PASKVAN, FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2012-03-21 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 25 | |
2012-03-21 | RES RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE | |
2012-03-05 | RES | |
2012-03-05 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-02 | VERSION: HJR 29 | |
2012-03-02 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-03-02 | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, SADDLER, KELLER, OLSON, KAWASAKI | |
2012-03-02 | PASSED Y37 E3 | |
2012-03-02 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 29 | |
2012-03-02 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-02 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-02 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/2/2012 | |
2012-02-20 | COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE | |
2012-02-20 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2012-02-20 | AM: KAWASAKI | |
2012-02-20 | DP: HERRON, P.WILSON, GARDNER, FOSTER, MUNOZ, DICK, SEATON, FEIGE | |
2012-02-20 | RES RPT 8DP 1AM | |
2012-02-01 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, THOMAS, GUTTENBERG, CISSNA, GATTO, CHENAULT | |
2012-01-27 | EDGMON, DICK, AUSTERMAN, JOHANSEN, HERRON | |
2012-01-27 | PETERSEN, DOOGAN, FOSTER, GARA, NEUMAN, HOLMES, P.WILSON, MILLER, SEATON, | |
2012-01-27 | COSPONSOR(S): JOULE, STOLTZE, COSTELLO, PRUITT, MUNOZ, LYNN, GARDNER, T.WILSON, | |
2012-01-25 | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2012-01-17 | RES | |
2012-01-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |