AK HJR19 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/04 LEGIS RESOLVE 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/04 LEGIS RESOLVE 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the Secretary of the United States Air Force, the Chief of Staff of the United States Air Force, and the Commander of the Pacific Air Forces to base F-35 aircraft assigned to the Pacific Air Forces at Eielson Air Force Base or Joint Base Elmendorf-Richardson.
Title
Base F-35 Aircraft At Eielson Or Jber
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House: Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: CSHJR 19(MLV) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: CSHJR 19(MLV) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: CSHJR 19(MLV) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: CSHJR 19(MLV) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 3/04 LEGIS RESOLVE 29 |
2014-03-03 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2014-03-03 | House | 6:18 PM 3/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-03-03 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 19 |
2014-03-03 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E5 |
2014-03-03 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-03-03 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-02-28 | Senate | VERSION: CSHJR 19(MLV) AM S |
2014-02-28 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-02-28 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 19 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E3 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | EGAN, MEYER, STEDMAN, FRENCH, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, DYSON, KELLY |
2014-02-28 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, GARDNER, GIESSEL, |
2014-02-28 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 19(MLV) AM S |
2014-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-28 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2014-02-28 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-28 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-28 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2014 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, GIESSEL |
2014-02-21 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP |
2014-02-12 | Senate | STA |
2014-02-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-10 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 19(MLV) |
2014-02-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-02-10 | House | KELLER, JOSEPHSON, TUCK |
2014-02-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE, JOHNSON, GUTTENBERG, TARR, COSTELLO, T.WILSON, KAWASAKI, |
2014-02-10 | House | PASSED Y35 E4 V1 |
2014-02-10 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2014-02-10 | House | ISAACSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-02-10 | House | PASSED Y35 E4 V1 |
2014-02-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 19(MLV) |
2014-02-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-10 | House | MLV CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2014 |
2014-02-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2014-02-07 | House | DP: GRUENBERG, HIGGINS, REINBOLD, SADDLER, HUGHES, FOSTER, LEDOUX |
2014-02-07 | House | MLV RPT CS(MLV) 7DP |
2014-02-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, FOSTER |
2014-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON, GRUENBERG |
2014-01-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2014-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2014-01-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2014-01-21 | House | MLV |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |