AK HJR14 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution: Fed Safe Banking Act/cannabis
Title
Resolution: Fed Safe Banking Act/cannabis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 6/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 6 |
2021-05-13 | House | 4:18 P.M. 5/13/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: HJR 14 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-10 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GRAY-JACKSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, REVAK, KIEHL |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 14 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.CRA) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | DP: GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-05-05 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, REVAK |
2021-05-05 | Senate | L&C RPT 1DP 2NR |
2021-04-23 | Senate | L&C |
2021-04-23 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-22 | House | VERSION: HJR 14 |
2021-04-22 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-04-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, STORY, CARPENTER, NELSON, SNYDER |
2021-04-22 | House | PASSED Y37 N3 |
2021-04-22 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 14 |
2021-04-22 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-04-22 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-22 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY |
2021-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, THOMPSON, VANCE |
2021-04-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.CRA) |
2021-04-07 | House | DP: MCCABE, PRAX, PATKOTAK, DRUMMOND, MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, HANNAN |
2021-04-07 | House | CRA RPT 7DP |
2021-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2021-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEBON, MCCARTY, MCCABE, PRAX, CRONK |
2021-03-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2021-03-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS |
2021-03-05 | House | CRA |
2021-03-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Attorneys
Business
Crimes
Drugs
Economy
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Marijuana
Medical Care
Minors
Public Land
Public Safety
Sales
Taxation
Attorneys
Business
Crimes
Drugs
Economy
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Marijuana
Medical Care
Minors
Public Land
Public Safety
Sales
Taxation