AK HJR14 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-14 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-14 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the United States Congress, the Governor, and the state's congressional delegation to take actions necessary to delay implementation of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
Delay Implementing Affordable Care Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - House: CSHJR 14(HSS) Second Reading Amendment to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: CSHJR 14(HSS) Second Reading Amendment to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 13 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - House: CSHJR 14(HSS) Second Reading Amendment to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 13 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE |
2013-04-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 14(HSS) AM S |
2013-04-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR |
2013-04-13 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-13 | Senate | HSS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-13 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-13 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2013 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2013-04-13 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, KELLY, MEYER |
2013-04-13 | Senate | HSS RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2013-04-10 | Senate | HSS |
2013-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 14(HSS) |
2013-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, PRUITT, LEDOUX, HUGHES, MILLETT |
2013-04-09 | House | PASSED Y23 N13 E2 A2 |
2013-04-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 14(HSS) |
2013-04-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-09 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y13 N24 E2 A1 |
2013-04-09 | House | AM NO 1 AS AM FAILED Y16 N21 E2 A1 |
2013-04-09 | House | AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y33 N5 E2 |
2013-04-09 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2013-04-09 | House | HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) |
2013-04-04 | House | NR: NAGEAK, PRUITT |
2013-04-04 | House | DNP: TARR |
2013-04-04 | House | DP: KELLER, REINBOLD, HIGGINS |
2013-04-04 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 3DP 1DNP 2NR |
2013-04-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2013-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, KELLER |
2013-03-22 | House | HSS |
2013-03-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Consumer Affairs
Economic Development
Economy
Employment
Executive Branch
Federal Aid
Governor
Health & Social Services
Insurance
Intergovernmental Relations
Medical Care
Municipalities
Pharmacists
State Aid
Taxation
Consumer Affairs
Economic Development
Economy
Employment
Executive Branch
Federal Aid
Governor
Health & Social Services
Insurance
Intergovernmental Relations
Medical Care
Municipalities
Pharmacists
State Aid
Taxation