AK HJR12 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Northern Rail Extension
Title
Northern Rail Extension
Sponsors
Rep. David Talerico [R] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. George Rauscher [R] | Rep. DeLena Johnson [R] |
Rep. Sharon Jackson [R] | Sen. Josh Revak [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 10 |
2019-10-23 | House | 11:52 A.M. 8/30/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-08 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | VERSION: HJR 12 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 12 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-14 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, SHOWER, WILSON, KIEHL, MICCICHE |
2019-05-09 | Senate | TRA RPT 5DP |
2019-05-07 | Senate | TRA |
2019-05-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-05-06 | House | VERSION: HJR 12 |
2019-05-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2019-05-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, JACKSON, REVAK |
2019-05-06 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2019-05-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 12 |
2019-05-06 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-06 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2019-04-17 | House | DP: STORY, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, RASMUSSEN, STUTES, WOOL |
2019-04-17 | House | TRA RPT 6DP |
2019-03-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2019-03-22 | House | DP: RAUSCHER, JACKSON, TARR, LEDOUX |
2019-03-22 | House | MLV RPT 4DP |
2019-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2019-03-13 | House | MLV, TRA |
2019-03-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Agriculture
Economic Development
Economy
Intergovernmental Relations
Military
Minerals
Mining
Railroad
Transportation
Warfare
Economic Development
Economy
Intergovernmental Relations
Military
Minerals
Mining
Railroad
Transportation
Warfare