AK HJR11 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/14 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/14 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorating the 30th anniversary of President Ronald Reagan's address to the nation concerning the Strategic Defense Initiative, recognizing the strategic importance of Alaska in the missile interceptor defense system, and urging the United States to deploy the number of ground-based interceptors originally intended at Fort Greely.
Title
Commem. Anniversary Of Reagan Sdi Speech
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Saddler [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Rep. Eric Feige [R] |
Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Lance Pruitt [R] | Rep. Doug Isaacson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 6/14 LEGIS RESOLVE 10 |
2013-06-24 | House | 1:32 PM 5/17/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-03 | Senate | VERSION: CSHJR 11(MLV) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-04-03 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 11(MLV) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-03 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-03 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2013-04-02 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2013-04-02 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 1NR |
2013-03-25 | Senate | STA |
2013-03-25 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-03-22 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 11(MLV) |
2013-03-22 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE, JOHNSON, PRUITT, ISAACSON |
2013-03-22 | House | PASSED Y34 E4 A2 |
2013-03-22 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 11(MLV) |
2013-03-22 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-22 | House | MLV CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-22 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-22 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2013-03-20 | House | DP: HUGHES, GRUENBERG, REINBOLD, SADDLER, LEDOUX, FOSTER |
2013-03-20 | House | MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP |
2013-03-13 | House | MLV |
2013-03-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |