AK HCR7 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming April 2015 as Child Abuse Prevention Month; and proclaiming April 10, 2015, as Go Blue Friday.
Title
Child Abuse Prevention Month
Sponsors
Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Sen. Matt Claman [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] |
Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2015-04-07 | Senate | STA |
2015-04-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-06 | House | VERSION: CSHCR 7(STA) |
2015-04-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, DRUMMOND, MILLETT, JOHNSON, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, LEDOUX |
2015-04-06 | House | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 |
2015-04-06 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-06 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2015-03-25 | House | DP: TALERICO, STUTES, GRUENBERG, VAZQUEZ, KREISS-TOMKINS, KELLER, LYNN |
2015-03-25 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 7DP |
2015-03-06 | House | STA |
2015-03-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |