AK HCR4 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, BUNDE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, BUNDE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the governor to provide energy security for Alaskans by taking and encouraging all appropriate action to support development of a natural gas bullet pipeline from the North Slope to the Cook Inlet region including advocating an increase in the amount of natural gas that may be exported under authority granted by the United States Department of Energy.
Title
In-state Gas Pipeline
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Chenault [R] | Rep. Nancy Dahlstrom [R] | Rep. Michael Hawker [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] |
Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Jay Ramras [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, BUNDE | |
2009-03-02 | REFERRED TO RESOURCES | |
2009-03-02 | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEDMAN | |
2009-03-02 | DP: MCGUIRE | |
2009-03-02 | ENE RPT 1DP 2NR | |
2009-02-19 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES | |
2009-02-11 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, MCGUIRE, MEYER, HUGGINS, STEVENS | |
2009-02-11 | ENE, RES | |
2009-02-11 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-02-09 | VERSION: HCR 4 AM | |
2009-02-09 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-02-09 | PASSED Y28 N6 E5 A1 | |
2009-02-09 | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION | |
2009-02-09 | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-02-09 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y29 N3 E5 A3 | |
2009-02-09 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-02-09 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/2009 | |
2009-02-06 | AM: KAWASAKI | |
2009-02-06 | NR: OLSON, P.WILSON | |
2009-02-06 | DP: TUCK, JOHNSON, NEUMAN | |
2009-02-06 | RES RPT 3DP 2NR 1AM | |
2009-02-04 | COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM | |
2009-02-04 | NR: JOHANSEN | |
2009-02-04 | DP: TUCK, DAHLSTROM, PETERSEN, RAMRAS, MILLETT, EDGMON | |
2009-02-04 | ENE RPT 6DP 1NR | |
2009-01-22 | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER | |
2009-01-21 | ENE, RES | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |