AK HCR26 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 4, relating to the Board of Barbers and Hairdressers; relating to a limited license to practice non-chemical barbering; relating to a license to practice hair braiding; and relating to the Department of Environmental Conservation.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 4
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-04-24 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 26 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-24 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-04-24 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2018-04-24 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
2018-04-23 | House | VERSION: HCR 26 |
2018-04-23 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-23 | House | PASSED Y36 E1 A3 |
2018-04-23 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2018-03-29 | House | RLS |
2018-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |