AK HCR23 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 194, relating to penalties and civil damages for certain alcohol violations.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 194
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 55 | |
2010-07-09 | 11:27 AM 6/11/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-17 | VERSION: HCR 23 | |
2010-04-17 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-17 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-17 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK | |
2010-04-16 | VERSION: HCR 23 | |
2010-04-16 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y27 E1 A12 | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-16 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2010 | |
2010-03-26 | RLS | |
2010-03-26 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |