AK HCR10 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the Alaska Maritime Workforce Development Industry Advisory Committee, the Alaska Workforce Investment Board, the Alaska Vocational Technical Education Center in Seward, and further efforts to carry out the Alaska Maritime Workforce Development Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maritime Workforce Development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-16HousePERMANENTLY FILED 8/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
2016-02-26HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2016-02-26House11:02 AM 2/25/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2016-02-12SenateVERSION: CSHCR 10(FSH)
2016-02-12SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2016-02-12SenatePASSED Y16 N2 E2
2016-02-12SenateWIELECHOWSKI
2016-02-12SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, STEVENS, EGAN, STEDMAN, GARDNER, ELLIS
2016-02-12SenateFN2: ZERO(LWF)(UPDATED FOR 2016)
2016-02-12SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2016-02-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-02-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2016
2015-04-17SenateFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2015-04-17SenateDP: COSTELLO, MEYER, STEVENS
2015-04-17SenateL&C RPT 3DP
2015-04-14SenateL&C
2015-04-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2015-04-13HouseVERSION: CSHCR 10(FSH)
2015-04-13HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2015-04-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK, HERRON, GARA, TARR, LYNN, JOSEPHSON, KITO
2015-04-13HousePASSED Y39 E1
2015-04-13HouseFSH CS ADOPTED UC
2015-04-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2015-04-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2015
2015-04-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2015-04-08HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2015-04-08HouseDP: HERRON, FOSTER, MILLETT, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, ORTIZ, STUTES
2015-04-08HouseFSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 7DP
2015-03-18HouseFSH
2015-03-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback