AK HB9 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska Gasline Development Corporation, a subsidiary created by the Alaska Housing Finance Corporation; establishing and relating to the in-state natural gas pipeline fund; making certain information provided to or by the Alaska Gasline Development Corporation exempt from inspection as a public record; relating to the Joint In-State Gasline Development Team; relating to the judicial review of a right-of-way lease or an action or decision related to the development or construction of an oil or gas pipeline on state land; relating to the lease of a right-of-way by the Alaska Gasline Development Corporation or a successor in interest for a gas pipeline transportation corridor; relating to the cost of natural resources, permits, and leases provided to the Alaska Gasline Development Corporation; relating to the review of natural gas transportation contracts by the Regulatory Commission of Alaska; relating to the regulation by the Regulatory Commission of Alaska of an in-state gas pipeline project developed by the Alaska Gasline Development Corporation; relating to the regulation by the Regulatory Commission of Alaska of an in-state natural gas pipeline that is expressly authorized to provide transportation as a contract carrier; relating to the Alaska Natural Gas Development Authority; relating to the procurement of certain services by the Alaska Natural Gas Development Authority; exempting property of a project developed by the Alaska Gasline Development Corporation from property taxes before the commencement of commercial operations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
In-state Gasline Development Corp
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2012-04-18 | THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2012-03-28 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGGINS, GIESSEL, MCGUIRE, MENARD, MEYER | |
2012-03-28 | REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS | |
2012-03-28 | CRA, RES, FIN | |
2012-03-28 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-27 | VERSION: CSHB 9(FIN) AM | |
2012-03-27 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-03-27 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-03-27 | PASSED Y27 N12 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 19 AS AM FAILED Y15 N24 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM TO AM 19 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 19 OFFERED | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 18 FAILED Y12 N27 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 17 FAILED Y12 N27 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 16 FAILED Y12 N27 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 15 FAILED Y12 N27 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 14 FAILED Y10 N29 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 13 FAILED Y12 N27 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 12 FAILED Y12 N26 E1 A1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 11 FAILED Y11 N28 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 10 FAILED Y12 N27 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 9 FAILED Y11 N28 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 8 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 7 FAILED Y12 N27 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 6 FAILED Y11 N28 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 5 FAILED Y12 N27 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 4 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 3 FAILED Y11 N28 E1 | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-27 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-27 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 AND ALL AMS UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-27 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 9(FIN) | |
2012-03-26 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, COSTELLO | |
2012-03-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/27 CALENDAR | |
2012-03-26 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-26 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-26 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2012 | |
2012-03-23 | FN2: (REV) | |
2012-03-23 | RESOURCES LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT | |
2012-03-23 | AM: GUTTENBERG | |
2012-03-23 | NR: DOOGAN, JOULE, STOLTZE | |
2012-03-23 | DNP: GARA | |
2012-03-23 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, THOMAS | |
2012-03-23 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 1DNP 3NR 1AM | |
2012-02-29 | COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT | |
2012-02-29 | FN1: (REV) | |
2012-02-29 | LETTER OF INTENT WITH RES REPORT | |
2012-02-29 | AM: DICK, P.WILSON | |
2012-02-29 | NR: FEIGE | |
2012-02-29 | DNP: KAWASAKI, GARDNER | |
2012-02-29 | DP: MUNOZ, FOSTER, HERRON, SEATON | |
2012-02-29 | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 4DP 2DNP 1NR 2AM | |
2012-01-17 | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER | |
2011-01-21 | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON | |
2011-01-18 | RES, FIN | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |
Subjects
Bonds & Bonding
Capital Projects
Energy
Executive Branch
Funds
Government Organization
Governor
Housing
Leases
Liability
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Permits
Pipelines
Planning
Procurements
Public Corporations
Public Records
Public Utilities
Taxation
Capital Projects
Energy
Executive Branch
Funds
Government Organization
Governor
Housing
Leases
Liability
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Permits
Pipelines
Planning
Procurements
Public Corporations
Public Records
Public Utilities
Taxation