AK HB87 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the liquefied natural gas storage facility tax credit; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Liquefied Natural Gas Storage Tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Thompson [R] | Rep. Grier Hopkins [D] | Rep. Barton LeBon [R] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Rep. Adam Wool [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | FIN |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-05-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 87(FIN) |
2019-05-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2019-05-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, TARR |
2019-05-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40 |
2019-05-14 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2019-05-14 | House | STUTES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2019-05-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2019-05-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 87(FIN) |
2019-05-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL |
2019-05-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CALENDAR |
2019-05-13 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-05-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2019 |
2019-05-13 | House | CS(FIN) RECEIVED |
2019-05-11 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2019-05-11 | House | NR: CARPENTER, TILTON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON |
2019-05-11 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, FOSTER |
2019-05-11 | House | (CS FORTHCOMING) |
2019-05-11 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 6NR |
2019-03-22 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2019-03-22 | House | NR: PRUITT |
2019-03-22 | House | DP: LINCOLN, ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS, RAUSCHER, HOPKINS |
2019-03-22 | House | ENE RPT 6DP 1NR |
2019-03-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEBON |
2019-03-08 | House | ENE, FIN |
2019-03-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |