AK HB8 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to protective orders.
Title
Enforcement Of Foreign Protective Orders
Sponsors
Rep. Bryce Edgmon [I] | Rep. Charles Kopp [R] | Rep. Zach Fansler [D] | Rep. Justin Parish [D] |
Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-04-24 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | AM: WIELECHOWSKI |
2017-04-24 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, DUNLEAVY, KELLY |
2017-04-24 | Senate | DP: COGHILL |
2017-04-24 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS(CRA) 1DP 3NR 1AM |
2017-04-05 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | NR: MACKINNON, STEDMAN, GARDNER |
2017-04-05 | Senate | DP: BISHOP |
2017-04-05 | Senate | CRA RPT SCS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2017-03-08 | Senate | CRA, JUD |
2017-03-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-06 | House | VERSION: HB 8 |
2017-03-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, JOSEPHSON |
2017-03-06 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2017-03-06 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y18 N22 |
2017-03-06 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2017-03-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 8 |
2017-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2017-03-01 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/6 CALENDAR |
2017-03-01 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-01 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO |
2017-02-17 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-02-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-02-17 | House | NR: EASTMAN, REINBOLD |
2017-02-17 | House | DP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, CLAMAN |
2017-02-17 | House | JUD RPT 4DP 2NR |
2017-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER, PARISH |
2017-02-01 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-02-01 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-02-01 | House | NR: RAUSCHER |
2017-02-01 | House | DP: TALERICO, WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, PARISH, FANSLER |
2017-02-01 | House | CRA RPT 5DP 1NR |
2017-01-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2017-01-18 | House | CRA, JUD |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |
Subjects
Age Of Persons
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Divorce
Domestic Violence
Injunctions
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Natives
Public Safety
Women
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Divorce
Domestic Violence
Injunctions
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Natives
Public Safety
Women