AK HB77 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - SECTIONAL ANALYSIS (H) JOURNAL SUP NO. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - SECTIONAL ANALYSIS (H) JOURNAL SUP NO. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making corrective amendments to the Alaska Statutes as recommended by the revisor of statutes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
2017 Revisor's Bill
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | SECTIONAL ANALYSIS (H) JOURNAL SUP NO. 4 |
2017-04-19 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2017-04-19 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/17 CHAPTER 3 SLA 17 |
2017-04-08 | House | 2:34 PM 4/8/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-03-20 | Senate | VERSION: HB 77 AM |
2017-03-20 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2017-03-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-03-20 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 77 AM |
2017-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-03-20 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-20 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | NR: KELLY, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI |
2017-03-15 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, MEYER |
2017-03-15 | Senate | JUD RPT 2DP 3NR |
2017-02-17 | Senate | JUD |
2017-02-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-02-15 | House | VERSION: HB 77 AM |
2017-02-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-02-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-02-15 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2017-02-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 77 AM |
2017-02-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-02-15 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2017-02-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-02-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-02-08 | House | NR: EASTMAN, REINBOLD |
2017-02-08 | House | DP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, LEDOUX, CLAMAN |
2017-02-08 | House | JUD RPT 5DP 2NR |
2017-01-25 | House | JUD |
2017-01-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Airports
Appropriations
Aviation
Boards & Commissions
Business
Capital Projects
Collective Bargaining
Consumer Affairs
Corporations
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Education
Employment
Environmental Concerns
Estates
Finance
Financial Institutions
Fish & Game (fish)
Health & Social Services
Judges
Labor
Legislature
Medical Care
Mental Health
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Parks & Recreation
School Districts
Securities
Statutes
Taxation
Teachers
Workers Compensation
Appropriations
Aviation
Boards & Commissions
Business
Capital Projects
Collective Bargaining
Consumer Affairs
Corporations
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Education
Employment
Environmental Concerns
Estates
Finance
Financial Institutions
Fish & Game (fish)
Health & Social Services
Judges
Labor
Legislature
Medical Care
Mental Health
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Parks & Recreation
School Districts
Securities
Statutes
Taxation
Teachers
Workers Compensation