AK HB76 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the mariculture revolving loan fund and loans from the fund; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mariculture Revolving Loan Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-09HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 28
2018-05-09HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-09HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1
2018-05-09HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-08HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-07SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 76(FIN)
2018-05-07SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-07SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-07SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-07SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 76(FIN)
2018-05-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-07SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-07SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-07SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2018
2018-05-04SenateFN4: ZERO(DFG)
2018-05-04SenateFN3: (CED)
2018-05-04SenateDP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-05-04SenateNR: MACKINNON, OLSON
2018-05-04SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 28
2018-05-04SenateFIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR NEW TITLE
2018-01-31SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS
2017-05-04SenateFIN
2017-05-04SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-01HouseVERSION: CSHB 76(FSH)
2017-05-01HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-05-01HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y35 N5
2017-05-01HousePASSED Y26 N14
2017-05-01HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-05-01HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N23
2017-05-01HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2017-05-01HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 76(FSH)
2017-04-28HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
2017-04-28HouseFSH CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-28HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-28HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2017
2017-04-27HouseFN2: ZERO(DFG)
2017-04-27HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-04-27HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2017-04-27HouseNR: WILSON, PRUITT, TILTON
2017-04-27HouseDP: GARA, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-27HouseFIN RPT CS(FSH) NT 7DP 3NR 1AM
2017-04-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-03-29HouseFN2: ZERO(DFG)
2017-03-29HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-29HouseNR: NEUMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS, CHENAULT
2017-03-29HouseDP: FANSLER, TARR, STUTES
2017-03-29HouseFSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 3DP 3NR
2017-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-01-25HouseFSH, FIN
2017-01-25HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback