AK HB76 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the membership of the Alaska Legislative Council and the membership of the Legislative Budget and Audit Committee.
Title
Legislative Council & Lb&a Membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-02-05 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2010-02-05 | NR: JOHNSON, GATTO, LYNN | |
2010-02-05 | DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN | |
2010-02-05 | STA RPT CS(STA) 3DP 3NR | |
2010-01-27 | COSPONSOR(S): N.FOSTER | |
2009-03-12 | COSPONSOR(S): GARA | |
2009-01-20 | STA, FIN | |
2009-01-20 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-20 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/16/09 |