AK HB69 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/22/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/22/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the reclassification of first class cities as second class cities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Reclassification Of First Class Cities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-13 - House - House: Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/22/23 |
2023-10-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/21 CHAPTER 10 SLA 23 |
2023-10-16 | House | 11:06 A.M. 6/13/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-13 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 |
2023-05-13 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2023-05-13 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2023-05-12 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 69(CRA) AM S |
2023-05-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2023-05-12 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-12 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2023-05-12 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2023-05-12 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2023-05-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 69(CRA) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CAL |
2023-05-11 | Senate | CRA SCS ADOPTED UC |
2023-05-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/23 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2023-05-01 | Senate | DP: DUNBAR, BJORKMAN, GIESSEL |
2023-05-01 | Senate | CRA RPT SCS(CRA) 3DP SAME TITLE |
2023-04-17 | Senate | CRA |
2023-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-04-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 69(CRA) |
2023-04-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2023-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI |
2023-04-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-04-14 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2023-04-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 69(CRA) |
2023-04-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR |
2023-04-12 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N36 |
2023-04-12 | House | CRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2023-04-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-04-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2023 |
2023-04-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2023-04-10 | House | DP: MEARS, MCKAY, HIMSCHOOT, RUFFRIDGE, MCCABE, MCCORMICK |
2023-04-10 | House | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 6DP |
2023-03-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2023-03-22 | House | NR: HIMSCHOOT, PRAX |
2023-03-22 | House | DP: STORY, MCKAY, MCCORMICK, ALLARD, RUFFRIDGE |
2023-03-22 | House | EDC RPT 5DP 2NR |
2023-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE |
2023-02-10 | House | EDC, CRA |
2023-02-10 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |