AK HB57 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act adopting the Alaska Entity Transactions Act; relating to changing the form of entities, including corporations, partnerships, limited liability companies, business trusts, and other organizations; amending Rule 79, Alaska Rules of Civil Procedure, and Rules 602(b)(2), 602(c), and 605.5, Alaska Rules of Appellate Procedure; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Entity Transactions Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates Court Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2013-09-10 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 60 SLA 13 |
2013-06-24 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2013-06-24 | House | 10:47 AM 6/21/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-13 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 57(JUD) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-04-13 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-13 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-13 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, COGHILL |
2013-04-13 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 57(JUD) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-13 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-13 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2013 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON |
2013-04-13 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE |
2013-04-13 | Senate | JUD RPT 2DP 2NR |
2013-04-11 | Senate | JUD |
2013-04-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-10 | House | VERSION: CSHB 57(JUD) |
2013-04-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-04-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT, JOSEPHSON, TUCK, KERTTULA |
2013-04-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-10 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-10 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E1 A1 |
2013-04-10 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2013-04-10 | House | PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2013-04-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-10 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-10 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2013-04-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 57(JUD) |
2013-04-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-10 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, GRUENBERG |
2013-04-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2013-04-09 | House | DP: GRUENBERG, PRUITT, FOSTER, LEDOUX, LYNN, KELLER |
2013-04-09 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP |
2013-01-16 | House | JUD |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/13 |