AK HB50 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the purchase of alcoholic beverages at a club and to access by certain persons under 21 years of age to a club's licensed premises when alcoholic beverages are present.
Title
Access To Licensed Premises
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Michael Hawker [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. Dan Saddler [R] | Rep. Steve Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2012-04-13 | FN2: ZERO(H.JUD/ALL DEPTS) | |
2012-04-13 | DP: FRENCH, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN | |
2012-04-13 | JUD RPT 4DP | |
2012-04-11 | FN2: ZERO(H.JUD/ALL DEPTS) | |
2012-04-11 | NR: DAVIS | |
2012-04-11 | DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, PASKVAN, MENARD | |
2012-04-11 | L&C RPT 4DP 1NR | |
2012-04-06 | L&C, JUD | |
2012-04-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-04-05 | VERSION: CSHB 50(JUD) | |
2012-04-05 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-04-05 | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GARA, LYNN, JOHNSON | |
2012-04-05 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y34 E3 A3 | |
2012-04-05 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC | |
2012-04-05 | KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2012-04-05 | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 | |
2012-04-05 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 50(JUD) | |
2012-04-05 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-05 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-05 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-05 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | FN2: ZERO(H.JUD/ALL DEPTS) | |
2012-03-21 | DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, KELLER, PRUITT, THOMPSON, GATTO | |
2012-03-21 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP | |
2011-04-05 | FN1: ZERO(H.L&C) | |
2011-04-05 | NR: HOLMES, MILLER | |
2011-04-05 | DP: CHENAULT, THOMPSON, SADDLER, JOHNSON, OLSON | |
2011-04-05 | L&C RPT 5DP 2NR | |
2011-04-04 | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON | |
2011-01-18 | L&C, JUD | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |