AK HB398 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the allocation and apportionment of income of a public utility for purposes of the Alaska Net Income Tax Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Corp Tax:public Utility Income Allocation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2018-07-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 55 SLA 18 |
2018-07-09 | House | 1:37 PM 7/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1 |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 398(FIN) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 398(FIN) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-10 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2018-05-04 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-05-04 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-05-04 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2018-04-20 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2018-04-20 | Senate | NR: WILSON, COGHILL |
2018-04-20 | Senate | DP: MEYER, GIESSEL, EGAN |
2018-04-20 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 2NR |
2018-04-12 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2018-04-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-11 | House | VERSION: HB 398 |
2018-04-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-11 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 398 |
2018-04-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2018-04-05 | House | NR: WILSON, KAWASAKI, GRENN, PRUITT, ORTIZ, GUTTENBERG, TILTON |
2018-04-05 | House | DP: GARA, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-05 | House | FIN RPT 4DP 7NR |
2018-02-23 | House | FIN |
2018-02-23 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |