AK HB384 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Regulatory Commission of Alaska and broadband Internet regulations.
Title
Regulatory Comm Of Ak; Broadband Internet
Sponsors
Rep. David Guttenberg [D] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] |
Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2018-04-30 | Senate | STA, L&C |
2018-04-30 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-27 | House | VERSION: HB 384 |
2018-04-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-27 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N17 E2 |
2018-04-27 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2018-04-27 | House | TUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-04-27 | House | FAILED PASSAGE Y20 N17 E2 A1 |
2018-04-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 384 |
2018-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2018-04-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR |
2018-04-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-26 | House | SESSION CANCELED 4/25 - ON 4/26 CALENDAR |
2018-04-23 | House | HELD TO 4/25 CALENDAR |
2018-04-23 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-04-12 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2018-04-12 | House | NR: ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GRENN |
2018-04-12 | House | DNP: WILSON, TILTON, PRUITT |
2018-04-12 | House | DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-12 | House | FIN RPT 4DP 3DNP 3NR 1AM |
2018-04-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-04-02 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2018-04-02 | House | DP: WOOL, EDGMON |
2018-04-02 | House | L&C RPT 2DP 2NR |
2018-02-21 | House | L&C, FIN |
2018-02-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Communications
Consumer Affairs
Internet
Public Utilities
Regulatory Actions
Utilities
Communications
Consumer Affairs
Internet
Public Utilities
Regulatory Actions
Utilities