AK HB349 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the establishment of oil and gas drilling units, spacing, and patterns; providing for the transfer of and addition of names to a personal use cabin permit for a cabin on state land; and providing for an effective date.
Title
O&g Units/spacing; Cabin Permits; Land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1.B - Page 1, line 11 through page 2, line 11 (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1.B - Page 1, line 11 through page 2, line 11 (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-06-30 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 13 SLA 22 |
2022-06-27 | House | 11:10 A.M. 6/27/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-16 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-20 | Senate | ENGROSSED AND RETURNED TO THE HOUSE 5/20 |
2022-05-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2022-05-18 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 29 |
2022-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 N4 A1 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR RECEIVED AND HELD |
2022-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 349(RES) AM S(EFD ADD S) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2022-05-18 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AM NO 4 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N12 A1 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N11 A3 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMDS UC |
2022-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 349(RES) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CAL |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-05-14 | Senate | AM: KAWASAKI |
2022-05-14 | Senate | NR: KIEHL, STEVENS |
2022-05-14 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, BISHOP |
2022-05-14 | Senate | RES RPT 2DP 2NR 1AM |
2022-05-12 | Senate | RES |
2022-05-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-05-11 | House | VERSION: CSHB 349(RES) |
2022-05-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-05-11 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2022-05-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 349(RES) |
2022-05-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN, DRUMMOND |
2022-05-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR |
2022-05-10 | House | AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED |
2022-05-10 | House | AM NO 1A FAILED Y5 N35 |
2022-05-10 | House | AM NO 1B FAILED N38 A2 |
2022-05-10 | House | AM NO 1 - DIVIDE THE AMENDMENT UC |
2022-05-10 | House | AM 2 TO AM 1 FAILED Y7 N31 A2 |
2022-05-10 | House | AM 1 TO AM 1 NOT OFFERED |
2022-05-10 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND PENDING |
2022-05-10 | House | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-09 | House | HELD TO 5/10 CALENDAR |
2022-05-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2022 |
2022-05-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN |
2022-05-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-05-02 | House | NR: CRONK, HOPKINS, HANNAN, PATKOTAK |
2022-05-02 | House | DP: MCKAY, RAUSCHER, GILLHAM, SCHRAGE |
2022-05-02 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 4DP 4NR |
2022-04-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-04-20 | House | DP: MCCARTY, MCCABE, PRAX, HANNAN, SCHRAGE |
2022-04-20 | House | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 5DP |
2022-04-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY, MCKAY, MCCABE, NELSON, SCHRAGE, PRAX |
2022-02-22 | House | CRA, RES |
2022-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Death
Families
Land
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Parks & Recreation
Permits
Public Land
Regulations
Resources
Death
Families
Land
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Parks & Recreation
Permits
Public Land
Regulations
Resources