AK HB342 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Board Of Real Estate Appraisers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 53 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:13 PM 6/1/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-17 | VERSION: HB 342 | |
2010-04-17 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-17 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 342 | |
2010-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-04-16 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-04-16 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-04-16 | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR | |
2010-04-11 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-04-11 | DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, DAVIS, BUNDE | |
2010-04-11 | L&C RPT 4DP | |
2010-03-15 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-12 | VERSION: HB 342 | |
2010-03-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-12 | COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT | |
2010-03-12 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-12 | PASSED Y36 E3 A1 | |
2010-03-12 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 342 | |
2010-03-12 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-03-11 | NR: DOOGAN, SALMON, FAIRCLOUGH, HAWKER, STOLTZE | |
2010-03-11 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, JOULE, KELLY, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER | |
2010-03-11 | FIN RPT 6DP 5NR | |
2010-02-26 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-02-26 | NR: BUCH | |
2010-02-26 | DP: LYNN, NEUMAN, CHENAULT, HOLMES, T.WILSON, OLSON | |
2010-02-26 | L&C RPT 6DP 1NR | |
2010-02-12 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-02-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |